Muniz v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angel Muniz
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01036
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Vina Johnson on behalf of Social Security Administration (Johnson, Victoria)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Angel Muniz. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
November 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The United States Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint personally on Defendant as directed by the Clerk. (kys)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kys)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Angel Muniz voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (MacDowell, Francesca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel Muniz, obo L.J.M., a minor. (MacDowell, Francesca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Angel Muniz, obo L.J.M., a minor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacDowell, Francesca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Muniz
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Victoria Vina Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?