Luker v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Valerie Luker
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01049
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valerie Luker Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Pinon, Aaron)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Initial Disclosures (Schwarz, Todd) Modified text on 1/3/2020 (mjr).
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 01/16/2020 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421. Joint Status Report due by 01/07/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/10/2019. (cm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Schwarz, Todd)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Schwarz, Todd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
November 8, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (aek)
November 8, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6790066 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schwarz, Todd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02643. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwarz, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luker v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Schwarz
Represented By: Samantha E Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Luker
Represented By: Aaron J Pinon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?