Buscema v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP et al
Plaintiff: Rita Buscema
Defendant: The Black & Decker Corporation, Spectrum Brands, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East LP and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01089
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (khs)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (KK)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 Letter by Jennifer G. Anderson to Magistrate Judge Khalsa. (eh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion for Remand and Supporting Memorandum by Rita Buscema. (Freedman, David)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Spectrum Brands, Inc., The Black & Decker Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Anderson, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 4) is granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by 12/17/2019. Should Defendants respond to the complaint by way of motion, Plaintiff has until 1/31/2020 to respond to the motion, and Defendants have until 2/21/2020 to file a reply. (kmt)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Spectrum Brands, Inc., The Black & Decker Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Anderson, Jennifer)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 12/23/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 1/3/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/8/2020. (kmt)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 22, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
November 21, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6814655 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The Black & Decker Corporation, Spectrum Brands, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Anderson, Jennifer)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Black & Decker Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Spectrum Brands, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-07293. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The Black & Decker Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Spectrum Brands, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Anderson, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buscema v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Buscema
Represented By: David A. Freedman
Represented By: Floyd D. Wilson, 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Black & Decker Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Emil Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Emil Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Emil Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Emil Kiehne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?