Velasquez v. NM Corporations Commission et al
Plaintiff: George Velasquez
Defendant: Los Alamos National Bank, NM Secretary of State Office, Enterprise Bank and NM Corporations Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv01119
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales dismissing this case without prejudice; and overruling #12 Plaintiff's Objection Letter to Appearance of Duncan Scott as moot. (tah)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTIONS re #10 Notice of Appearance by George Velasquez (yc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Los Alamos National Bank. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by George Velasquez.(Basile, Valentina)
January 7, 2020 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales assigned. (aek)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Valentina Elizabeth Basile on behalf of Los Alamos National Bank (Basile, Valentina)
December 31, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Los Alamos National Bank answer due 1/8/2020; NM Secretary of State Office answer due 1/8/2020. (arp)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Los Alamos National Bank served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (jg) Modified on 12/31/2019 (arp).
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed NM Secretary of State Office served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (jg) Modified on 12/31/2019 (arp).
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by George Velasquez. (jg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by George Velasquez electing to receive notification via postal mail. (ln)
December 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Los Alamos National Bank and NM Secretary of State Office. (gr)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (ccp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 2, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SF003250 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Velasquez. (gr) filed by George Velasquez. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of CM/ECF Pro Se Notification form by George Velasquez. Plaintiff elects to receive notifications via email. (gr)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Velasquez. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. NM Corporations Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Alamos National Bank
Represented By: Valentina Elizabeth Basile
Represented By: Duncan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NM Secretary of State Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Bank
Represented By: Valentina Elizabeth Basile
Represented By: Duncan Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NM Corporations Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?