Velasquez v. Grisham et al
Plaintiff: George Velasquez
Defendant: Hector Balderas, Maggie Toulouse Oliver, Steven Salas, Ken Ortiz, Michelle Lujan Grisham and Ben Ray Lujan
Case Number: 1:2019cv01120
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing case without prejudice by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (yc) Modified to correct text on 12/20/2019 (bc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack DISMISSING #1 Complaint. (yc)
December 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (gr)
December 18, 2019 Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack assigned. (dr)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause filed by George Velasquez. (ln)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Show Cause Response due by 12/24/2019. (jdm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 2, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number SF003251 re #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Velasquez. (gr) filed by George Velasquez. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of CM/ECF Pro Se notification form by George Velasquez. (gr)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Velasquez. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Grisham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Balderas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lujan Grisham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Ray Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Velasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?