Hanson v. Fenn
Plaintiff: David Harold Hanson
Defendant: Forrest Fenn
Intervenor: Brian Erskine
Case Number: 1:2019cv01124
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to Forrest Fenn. (ln)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER AND CROSS-CLAIM by Brian Erskine. (jg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #9 MOTION to Intervene by Brian Erskine (jg)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Brian Erskine. (ln)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene by Brian Erskine. (ln)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa denying #5 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 as moot; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as moot. (jdm)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 17, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB045519 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by David Harold Hanson. (ln)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Cure Defects Cure Defects by 12/24/2019. by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jdm)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 3, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Harold Hanson. (arp)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forrest Fenn, filed by David Harold Hanson. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson v. Fenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest Fenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harold Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Brian Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?