Cooper et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Malcolm Cooper and Agatha Cooper
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department and Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2019cv01141
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Rodriguez on behalf of New Mexico Public Education Department (Rodriguez, Aaron)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NMPED and APS by New Mexico Public Education Department. (Poulin, Debra)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra D Poulin on behalf of New Mexico Public Education Department (Poulin, Debra)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools Acceptance of Service (Howard-Hand, Evelyn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Agatha Cooper, Malcolm Cooper as to New Mexico Public Education Department. (Stewart, Gail)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 5, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
December 4, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6836110 re #1 Complaint filed by Agatha Cooper, Malcolm Cooper (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stewart, Gail)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to remedy disability discrimination in public education against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Agatha Cooper, Malcolm Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Gail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Cooper
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agatha Cooper
Represented By: Gail S Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Public Education Department
Represented By: Debra D Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Albuquerque Public Schools
Represented By: Evelyn Howard-Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?