Rio Grande Foundation et al v. Toulouse Oliver
Plaintiff: Illinois Opportunity Project and Rio Grande Foundation
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Case Number: 1:2019cv01174
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020. (aek)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 2/25/2020 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties have the option of appearing telephonically by calling Judge Robbenhaars AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code: 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Any party wishing to appear by telephone should inform chambers within twenty-four hours of the scheduling conference by calling (505) 348-2370 or emailing robbenhaarchambers@nmd.uscourts.gov. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/13/2020. JSR due 2/11/2020. (smd)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M Sydow on behalf of Maggie Toulouse Oliver (Sydow, Nicholas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Maggie Toulouse Oliver. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Rio Grande Foundation.(Sydow, Nicholas)
December 17, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6858056 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin)
December 17, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6858040 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rio Grande Foundation by Colin Lambert Hunter on behalf of: Jeffrey M. Schwab Liberty Justice Center 190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500Chicago 3122637668 jschwab@libertyjusticecenter.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hunter, Colin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Rio Grande Foundation by Colin Lambert Hunter on behalf of: Daniel R. Suhr Liberty Justice Center 190 S. LaSalle St., Suite 1500Chicago 3122637668 dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hunter, Colin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Maggie Toulouse Oliver. (arp)
December 13, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6853371 re #1 Complaint filed by Rio Grande Foundation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunter, Colin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
December 13, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Rio Grande Foundation CERTIFICATE OF GOODSTANDING (Hunter, Colin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rio Grande Foundation identifying Corporate Parent Rio Grande Foundation for Rio Grande Foundation. (Hunter, Colin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Civil Rights Violations against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Rio Grande Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunter, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rio Grande Foundation et al v. Toulouse Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Opportunity Project
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rio Grande Foundation
Represented By: Colin Lambert Hunter
Represented By: Jeffrey M Schwab
Represented By: Daniel R Suhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Toulouse Oliver
Represented By: Nicholas M Sydow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?