Thornton v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robin G. Thornton and Michael Lucero
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc. and Cargill Meat Solution, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00105
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Fisher, Brian)
March 17, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall J Ray on behalf of Michael Lucero, Robin G. Thornton (Ray, Marshall)
March 16, 2020 Filing 46 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Appearance by A. Blair Dunn on behalf of Michael Lucero, Robin G. Thornton (Dunn, A.) Modified docket text on 3/17/2020 (ln).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting #42 Motion to Consolidate Cases.(ve)
March 9, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Thornton's Complaint filed by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Walker, Alex)
March 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Thornton's Complaint by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp., JBS USA Food Company, National Beef Packing Company, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Walker, Alex)
March 4, 2020 Filing 42 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pre-Trial Purposes by National Beef Packing Company, LLC. (Burris, Eric)
February 27, 2020 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Cargill Incorporated for Cargill Meat Solution, Corp.. (Walker, Alex)
February 24, 2020 Filing 40 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-6978470 re: 34 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 39 "FILED IN ERROR" Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Beef Packing Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NBM US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Marfrig Global Foods S.A. for National Beef Packing Company, LLC. (Burris, Eric) Modified text on 2/25/2020 (bap).
February 24, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Beef Packing Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NBM US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Marfrig Global Foods S.A. for National Beef Packing Company, LLC. (Burris, Eric)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Fisher on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Fisher, Brian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Tyson Foods, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing (Armir Nassihi) (Fisher, Brian)
February 24, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE by Tyson Foods, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing (Mark Tatum) (Fisher, Brian)
February 24, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6978439 re: # 33 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Huertaz, Armand)
February 21, 2020 Filing 34 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Armand D. Huertaz on behalf of: Mark Tatum Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P. 2555 Grand BoulevardKansas City, Missouri 64108 816-474-6550 Fax 816-421-5547 mtatum@shb.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Huertaz, Armand)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 33 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. by Armand D. Huertaz on behalf of: Amir M. Nassihi Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P. One Montgomery Street, 26th FloorSan Francisco, California 94104 415-544-1900 Fax 415-391-0281 anassihi@shb.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Huertaz, Armand)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 32 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-6969353 re: 26 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant JBS USA Food Company (aek)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 19, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6969478 re: # 27 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by JBS USA Food Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JBS USA Food Company identifying Corporate Parent JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Corporate Parent JBS S.A. for JBS USA Food Company. (Schultz, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by JBS USA Food Company of Appearance by Patrick Brookhouser and Matthew Munro (McGrath North) (Schultz, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by JBS USA Food Company of Certification of Good Standing (Matthew Munro) (Schultz, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by JBS USA Food Company of Certification of Good Standing (Patrick Brookhouser) (Schultz, Andrew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 27 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Matthew G. Munro McGrath North 1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700Omaha, NE 68102 (402) 341-3070 Fax (402) 341-0216 mmunro@mcgrathnorth.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 26 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Andrew G. Schultz on behalf of: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. McGrath North 1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700Omaha, NE 68102 (402) 341-3070 Fax (402) 341-0216 pbrookhouser@mcgrathnorth.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Schultz, Andrew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by National Beef Packing Company, LLC re 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Robert M. Thompson (Burris, Eric)
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by National Beef Packing Company, LLC re 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Jennifer A. Jackson (Burris, Eric)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by National Beef Packing Company, LLC re 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Cassandra Rose Wait (Burris, Eric)
February 13, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6958417 re: # 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Beef Packing Company, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burris, Eric)
February 12, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6956692 re: # 21 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel Tyler A. Young (Walker, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 21 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. by Alex Cameron Walker on behalf of: Tyler A. Young Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP 2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh StreetMinneapolis, MN 55402 (612) 766-7000 Fax (612) 766-1600 tyler.young@faegredrinker.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Walker, Alex)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6956512 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Walker, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. of Certification of Good Standing of Associated Counsel Michael M. Sawers (Walker, Alex)
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. by Alex Cameron Walker on behalf of: Michael M. Sawers Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP 2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh StreetMinneapolis, MN 55402 (612) 766-7000 Fax (612) 766-1600 michael.sawers@faegredrinker.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Walker, Alex)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6956175 re: # 17 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Beef Packing Company, LLC, 18 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Beef Packing Company, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burris, Eric)
February 12, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6956163 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by National Beef Packing Company, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Burris, Eric)
February 12, 2020 Filing 18 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Beef Packing Company, LLC by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Jennifer A. Jackson Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 120 Broadway, Ste 300Santa Monica, CA 90401 310-576-2100 Jennifer.Jackson@bclplaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 17 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Beef Packing Company, LLC by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Robert M. Thompson Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 1200 Maine St., Ste 3800Kansas City, Missouri 66212 816-374-3200 Robert.Thompson@bclplaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant National Beef Packing Company, LLC by Eric R. Burris on behalf of: Cassandra Rose Wait Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP 1200 Maine St., Ste 3800Kansas City, Missouri 66212 816-374-3200 Cassie.wait@bryancave.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Burris, Eric)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand D. Huertaz on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Fisher, Brian) Modified on 2/12/2020 to reflect correct atty (cmm).
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand D. Huertaz on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Huertaz, Armand)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION OF DEFENDANT NATIONAL BEEF PACKING COMPANY,LLC TO CONSOLIDATE BRIEFING ON MOTION TO DISMISS,EXTEND PAGE LIMITS AND ESTABLISH BRIEFING SCHEDULE by District Judge Kea W. Riggs granting #11 ORDER on Motion for Order; granting #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ve)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Consolidate Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Page Limits and Establish Briefing Schedule by National Beef Packing Company, LLC. (Burris, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Fisher on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Fisher, Brian)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Tyson Foods, Inc. Tyson Foods, Inc.'s Consent to Removal (Fisher, Brian)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by National Beef Packing Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Burris, Eric)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Debashree Nandy on behalf of National Beef Packing Company, LLC (Nandy, Debashree)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Burris on behalf of National Beef Packing Company, LLC (Burris, Eric)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Cargill Meat Solution, Corp. of Consent of Removal (Walker, Alex)
February 5, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6942873 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JBS USA Food Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Schultz, Andrew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
February 5, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JBS USA Food Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-cv-2020-00109. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by JBS USA Food Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Pleadings), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Represented By: Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew G. Munro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Beef Packing Company, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer A Jackson
Represented By: Cassandra Rose Wait
Represented By: Debashree Nandy
Represented By: Robert M Thompson
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Tatum
Represented By: Amir M. Nassihi
Represented By: Brian J. Fisher
Represented By: Armand D. Huertaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solution, Corp.
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Tyler A Young
Represented By: Michael M Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin G. Thornton
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Marshall J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lucero
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Marshall J. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?