Leyba v. City of Albuquerque et al
Plaintiff: Joe A. Leyba
Defendant: City of Albuquerque, Metropolitan Detention Center, County of Bernalillo and Ian Smalls
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 FINANCIAL Certificate of Inmate Account by Joe A. Leyba. (gr)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (plp)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 FINANCIAL ENTRY Inmate account by Joe A. Leyba. (gr)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 1 Complaint by Joe A. Leyba. (gr)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE, filed by Joe A. Leyba. (mjr)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joe A. Leyba. (arp)
February 18, 2020 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leyba v. City of Albuquerque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Bernalillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Smalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe A. Leyba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?