Robinson v. State of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Sant Robinson
Defendant: New Mexico Attorney General, City of Albuquerque Attorney, County of Bernalillo County Attorney, County of Los Alamos County Attorney, County of Santa Fe County Attorney, State of New Mexico, County of Rio Arriba, City of Las Vegas Attorney and County of San Miguel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Imposing Filing Restrictions by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 20-2036 for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by Deborah Sant Robinson. (mjr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 Transmission of Preliminary Record to US Court of Appeals re #13 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 PROA) (mjr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Memorandum Opinion and Order,, Order to Show Cause, by Deborah Sant Robinson. (Appeal Fee Not Paid.) (mjr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Deborah Sant Robinson. (mjr)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing by Deborah Sant Robinson. (mjr)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Deborah Sant Robinson. (mjr)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Receipt of Remand by First Judicial State Court. (mjr)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to First Judicial State Court re; Remand. (mjr)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera remanding the state court cases in #1 Notice of Removal to the First Judicial District Court, State of New Mexico, and denying as moot #4 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff Robinson is ordered to show cause, in writing, why the proposed filing restrictions described herein should not be entered. Ms.Robinson's Show Cause Response is due by 3/17/2020. (baw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Letter by Deborah Robinson (mjr)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deborah Sant Robinson. (mjr)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deborah Sant Robinson re #1 Notice of Removal. (gr)
February 19, 2020 United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera assigned. (arp)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deborah Sant Robinson from First Judicial District Court, case number D-132-CV-201600110, filed by Deborah Sant Robinson. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Bernalillo County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Alamos County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Fe County Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Rio Arriba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sant Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?