Barile et al v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Barile and Jon Wolles
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00195
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Peter Barile, Jon Wolles re #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jon Wolles, Peter Barile (Rivard, Catherine)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Peter Barile, Jon Wolles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rivard, Catherine)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Peter Barile, Jon Wolles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C") (Rivard, Catherine)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines, and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4) are VACATED. (kc)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Modifying Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4) (As to Location Only). The Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/16/2020 at 2:30 p.m. will be held telephonically. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee payment received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-7005552 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 730 Judge John F. Robbenhaar Chambers before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/26/2020. (kc)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 5, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judiial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-03023. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Croasdell, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barile et al v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Barile
Represented By: Catherine L. Rivard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Wolles
Represented By: Catherine L. Rivard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?