Franco v. State of New Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Josephine Franco and Josephine V Franco
Defendant: State of New Mexico, B Rodriguez and City of Santa Fe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00223
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson in favor of Defendants. (mag)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson dismissing Complaint without prejudice. (mag)
April 10, 2020 Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson assigned. (jg)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of entry of this Order (jdm)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 12, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of CM/ECF Pro se Notification form by Josephine Franco. (gr)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Josephine Franco. (gr)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Santa Fe. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franco v. State of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Fe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine V Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?