Provencio v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Suzanne Lucero Provencio
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00227
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Karen B Molzen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration, 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Suzanne Lucero Provencio. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney General served on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (jg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed U.S. Attorney's Office served on 4/17/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. (jg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration served on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (jg)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Valerio on behalf of Social Security Administration (Valerio, Christina)
March 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arp)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is authorized to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee, costs, or security therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Summons and Complaint on the United States Attorney, the Attorney General, and the Office of the General Counsel, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). (KBM)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Suzanne Lucero Provencio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Application)) (Martone, Feliz)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Suzanne Lucero Provencio voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martone, Feliz)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 12, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (arp)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Suzanne Lucero Provencio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martone, Feliz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provencio v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Lucero Provencio
Represented By: Feliz MariSol Martone
Represented By: Gary J Martone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Christina Valerio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?