Clifford et al v. Turkish Airline
Plaintiff: Rachael Clifford, Alexander Clifford, Emeka E. Clifford and Benjamin Clifford
Defendant: Turkish Airline
Case Number: 1:2020cv00241
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION re #17 Notice (Other) filed by Turkish Airline (yc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Turkish Airline JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (Furness, Aimee)
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #14 Order on Motion to Stay,. Mail sent to Mr. Hood (yc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 12 Notice of Judge Reassignment,,. Mail sent to Attorney, Michael L. Hood (yc)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting in part #13 Joint Motion for 60-Day Stay to Complete Settlement. Closing documents shall be filed within 60 days from the date of this Order, absent a showing of good cause for an extension. Defendant's deadline to reply #5 Motion to Dismiss is stayed pending the filing of closing documents. (cm)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay to Complete Settlement by Turkish Airline. (Furness, Aimee)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #10 Response in Opposition to Motion by Emeka E. Clifford (jg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support filed by Emeka E. Clifford. (ln)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough finding good cause to extend the time to issue the scheduling order pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Court will delay the issuance of its Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of #5 Motion to Dismiss. [THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY- NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cm)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (plp)
March 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Turkish Airline re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing (Furness, Aimee)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Turkish Airline by Aimee M Furness on behalf of: Michael Hood Haynes and Boone, LLP 2323 Victory Ave., Suite 700Dallas, TX 75219 2146515000 michael.hood@haynesboone.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Furness, Aimee)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Brief in Support by Turkish Airline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Furness, Aimee)
March 23, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-7041452 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Turkish Airline (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Furness, Aimee)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Turkish Airline re Add and Terminate Judges, 3 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only),,, (Furness, Aimee)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Furness, Aimee)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Inc. from Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-202000986. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Furness, Aimee)
March 16, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7028198 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Turk Hava Yollari Anonim Ortakligi, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Furness, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifford et al v. Turkish Airline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emeka E. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turkish Airline
Represented By: Aimee M Furness
Represented By: Michael L. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?