Campbell v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mia Coy Campbell
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00253
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE re #3 Order filed by Mia Coy Campbell. (yc)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter regarding 2255 Motion and granting leave to amend. (plp)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy M Castellano on behalf of United States of America (Castellano, Randy)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (ln)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Mia Coy Campbell. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mia Coy Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Randy M Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?