Moreno et al. v. Gandhi
Plaintiff: Lorenza Moreno and Joseph Moreno
Defendant: Mrugendra Gandhi
Case Number: 1:2020cv00270
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION For Expedited Order To Reveal Identity of Witness filed by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Lyle, James)
April 29, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mrugendra Gandhi re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending New Mexico Medical Review Commission Panel Hearing filed by Mrugendra Gandhi (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending New Mexico Medical Review Commission Panel Hearing filed by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 29, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Mrugendra Gandhi re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Mrugendra Gandhi (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Lorenza Moreno, Joseph Moreno (Lyle, James)
April 28, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Lyle, James)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION For Expedited Order To Reveal Identity of Witness filed by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 Plaintiffs' REPLY To Defendant's Response To Plaintiffs' Motion For Default Judgment re #12 Response filed by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Lyle, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Lyle, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending New Mexico Medical Review Commission Panel Hearing filed by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Lyle, James)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand Motion for Sanctions for Improper Removal and Fraud Upon the Court, and Request for Expedited Hearin filed by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stewart, M.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Mrugendra Gandhi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND RULE 16 HEARING by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The May 5, 2020, hearing is vacated, as well as additional deadlines set in the Initial Scheduling Order #5 . The Court will reset deadlines after resolution of the pending dispositive motions. (smd)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION For Expedited Order To Reveal Identity of Witness by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lyle, James)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending New Mexico Medical Review Commission Panel Hearing by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kenny, Rebecca)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Insufficient Service of Process by Mrugendra Gandhi. (Kenny, Rebecca)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Joseph Moreno, Lorenza Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Lyle, James)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, AccessCode 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/15/2020. (smd)
March 25, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7046517 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kenny, Rebecca)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 25, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Eliza Stewart on behalf of Mrugendra Gandhi (Stewart, M.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kenny on behalf of Mrugendra Gandhi (Kenny, Rebecca)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mrugendra Gandhi, M.D Notice of Removal from Fourth Judicial District Court, case number D-412-CV-2020-00015. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mrugendra Gandhi, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Kenny, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno et al. v. Gandhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenza Moreno
Represented By: James P. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moreno
Represented By: James P. Lyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrugendra Gandhi
Represented By: Rebecca Kenny
Represented By: M. Eliza Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?