Velasquez et al v. ION Solar, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Velasquez, Dominque Velasquez and Dominique Velasquez
Defendant: Nathan Slemboski, Ion Solar, LLC, Juggernaut, Inc. and Service Finance Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00277
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Ion Solar, LLC of Substitution of Counsel, Entry of Appearance, and Withdrawal of Counsel (Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (kmt)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 9/29/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 9/17/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiffs' demand letters are due to Defendants by 9/1/2020. Defendants' counteroffer letters are due to Plaintiffs by 9/11/2020. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 9/15/2020. (kmt)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs to seek leave to join and amend by 7/6/2020. Defendants to seek leave to join and amend by 7/20/2020. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 8/3/2020. Defendants' expert disclosures due by 9/3/2020. Discovery due by 2/1/2021. Discovery motions due by 2/22/2021. Pretrial motions due by 3/4/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiffs to Defendants by 4/23/2021 and from Defendants to the Court by 5/7/2021. (kmt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 33 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/12/2020. (kmt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dominique Velasquez, Jerry Velasquez Plaintiffs First Set Of Discovery to Ion Solar, LLC f/k/a Zing Solar of New Mexico LLC and Zing Solar, Inc.; (2) Plaintiffs First Set Of Discovery to Juggernaut, Inc.; (3) Plaintiffs First Set Of Discovery to Nathan Slemboski; and (4) Plaintiffs First Set Of Discovery to Service Finance Company, LLC (Treinen, Rob)
May 12, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Protective Order by Dominique Velasquez, Jerry Velasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Treinen, Rob)
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 28. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 6, 2020 Filing 29 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski re Initial Disclosures (Lowry, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Service Finance Company, LLC re Initial Disclosures (Ferguson, Kenneth)
May 4, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dominique Velasquez, Jerry Velasquez Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures (Treinen, Rob)
May 4, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ion Solar, LLC Initial Disclosures (Dempsey, Dustin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Ion Solar, LLC (Dempsey, Dustin)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ion Solar, LLC (Dempsey, Dustin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Ferguson on behalf of Service Finance Company, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
April 23, 2020 Filing 20 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Service Finance Company, LLC by Kenneth Ferguson on behalf of: Jennifer Foster Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP 816 Congress Avenue, #1510Austin, TX 78701 512-391-0197 Fax 512-391-0183 jfoster@grsm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Ferguson, Kenneth)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 23, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7091263 re: # 20 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Service Finance Company, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferguson, Kenneth)
April 17, 2020 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Service Finance Company, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-7070675 re: 13 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Juggernaut, Inc., Defendant Nathan Slemboski (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # 1084-7070656 re: 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Defendant Juggernaut, Inc., Defendant Nathan Slemboski (arp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juggernaut, Inc. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski. (Lowry, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski (Lowry, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of: Amy M. Pauli Armstrong Teasdale LLP 4643 South Ulster Street, Suite 800Denver, CO 80237 720-200-0676 Fax 720-200-0679 apauli@atllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski (Lowry, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of: Michael Gehret Armstrong Teasdale LLP 4643 South Ulster Street, Suite 800Denver, CO 80237 720-200-0676 Fax 720-200-0679 mgehret@atllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lowry, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Lowry on behalf of Juggernaut, Inc., Nathan Slemboski (Lowry, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Juggernaut, Inc. c/o James Slemboski on 3/19/2020, filed by Dominique Velasquez, Jerry Velasquez. (Treinen, Rob)
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Ferguson, Kenneth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Service Finance Company, LLC (Ferguson, Kenneth)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Ferguson, Kenneth) Modified on 4/6/2020 (arp).
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 4/23/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 5/4/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 5/12/2020 at 10:45 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/7/2020. (kmt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 30, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-7051830 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Service Finance Company, LLC from 2nd Judicial Dist. Court, Bernalillo County, NM, case number d-202-cv-2020-01368. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Service Finance Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit A - Pl Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit A - Arbitration Certification, #5 Exhibit A - Notice of Excusal, #6 Exhibit A - Judge Reassignment, #7 Exhibit A - Service Finance Summons, #8 Exhibit A - ION Solar Summons, #9 Exhibit A - ION Solar Answer, #10 Exhibit A - ION Solar Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit B - ION Solar Consent to Removal, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez et al v. ION Solar, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Slemboski
Represented By: Amy M. Pauli
Represented By: Michael Gehret
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ion Solar, LLC
Represented By: Dustin D. Dempsey
Represented By: Michael Gehret
Represented By: Amy M. Pauli
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juggernaut, Inc.
Represented By: Amy M. Pauli
Represented By: Michael Gehret
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Finance Company, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Ferguson
Represented By: Jennifer Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Velasquez
Represented By: David C Kramer
Represented By: Rob Treinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominque Velasquez
Represented By: David C Kramer
Represented By: Rob Treinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Velasquez
Represented By: David C Kramer
Represented By: Rob Treinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?