Lucero v. Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lucero
Defendant: Alfonso Martinez, Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc., Donna Martinez, Carlos Salazar, Dwight Herrera, Randy Vigil and Board of Directors of Jemez Mountains Cooperative, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00311
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Dwight Herrera, Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc., Donna Martinez, Randy Vigil re 25 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,,, Consent to Court Conducting Hearing Telephonically and Out of District (Wiggins, Lorna)
June 4, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Alfonso Martinez, Carlos Salazar re 25 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,,, 26 Minute Order,,, of consent to Court conducting hearing out of state and by telephone (Martinez, Jonlyn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER pursuant to the direction of District Judge James O. Browning re #22 Initial Scheduling Order: notifying the parties that the Court will be in the Dallas, Texas area on June 25, 2020 and that the Court would like to conduct the hearing out of district and by telephone. The purpose of this notice is, in part, to request consent from the parties to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of district from the Dallas, Texas area. If the parties consent to the Court doing so, they should submit a filing with the Court so stating Consent to Allow the Court to Conduct the Hearing Out of the District from the Dallas, Texas Area. If they do not consent, they should submit a filing so stating and the hearing will be rescheduled. Should counsel also wish to appear telephonically for the hearing they should call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 5469085. (cjw)
June 4, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #14 MOTION for Default Judgment as to, #4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Also, notifying the parties that the Court will be in the Dallas, Texas area on June 25, 2020 and that the Court would like to conduct the hearing out of district and by telephone. The purpose of this notice is, in part, to request consent from the parties to allow the Court to conduct the hearing out of district from the Dallas, Texas area. If the parties consent to the Court doing so, they should submit a filing with the Court so stating Consent to Allow the Court to Conduct the Hearing Out of the District from the Dallas, Texas Area. If they do not consent, they should submit a filing so stating and the hearing will be rescheduled. Should counsel also wish to appear telephonically for the hearing they should call the Court's AT&T Conference line at 1-888-684-8852, Access Code: 5469085. (cjw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc. (Wiggins, Lorna)
May 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Donna Martinez re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Wiggins, Lorna)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
May 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 17. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Alfonso Martinez, Carlos Salazar re #4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alfonso Martinez, Carlos Salazar (Martinez, Jonlyn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Alfonso Martinez, Carlos Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email) (Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 26, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Jimmy Lucero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Salcedo, Betsy)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Randy Vigil re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Wiggins, Lorna)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Randy Vigil. (Wiggins, Lorna)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jimmy Lucero as to Donna Martinez. (Salcedo, Betsy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 10 RESPONSE to Defendant Salazar's Motion for Default re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jimmy Lucero. (Salcedo, Betsy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 *FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jimmy Lucero Response to Mtn Default by C Salazar Defendant from First Judicial, case number D117CV2020-00018. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jimmy Lucero. (Salcedo, Betsy) Will refile under Response. Modified on 4/22/2020 (arp).
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc.. (Wiggins, Lorna)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Carlos Salazar re #6 Reply, of Completion of Briefing Concerning Motion for Default Judgment (Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to Motion for Default Judgment re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Carlos Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Petitioner's Response to Motion for Default Judgment, #3 Exhibit Email, #4 Exhibit Email) (Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Dwight Herrera, Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Wiggins, Lorna)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Alfonso Martinez, Carlos Salazar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Order of Non-determination) (Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Carlos Salazar re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 14 Counter-Plaintiff Salazar's MOTION for Default Judgment re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL entered 4/07/2020. (ng)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
April 7, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
April 7, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7066252 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Alfonso Martinez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Jonlyn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alfonso Martinez from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2020-00018. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Alfonso Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit Other State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit Other State Court Filings, #5 Exhibit Other State Court Filings)(Martinez, Jonlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonso Martinez
Represented By: Jonlyn M Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemez Mountains Electric Cooperative Inc.
Represented By: Lorna M. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Salazar
Represented By: Jonlyn M Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Herrera
Represented By: Lorna M. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Vigil
Represented By: Lorna M. Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of Jemez Mountains Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Lucero
Represented By: Betsy R Salcedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?