Soto et al v. Governor of the State of New Mexico, et al
Petitioner: Patrick Hopkins, Dainte D Sanders, Jonathan Duran, Michael Martin, Ruben Olivas, Raymond Hernandez, Douglas Cooper, Adam Stephens, Omar Herrera, Manuel Soto, Matthew J Zubia, Santana Bycck, Ronald A Saiz, Charles Robinson, Raymundo Vargas, Paul Garche, Jessie Romero, Donovin Santiago, Matthew Nieto, Tyler Treadway, Eric R Ford, Eric Apodaca, Tyler James Valentino, Anthony Jury, Manuel Hos, Daniel Joseph Thomas Standley, Freddy Chavez, Freddie D Chavez, Anthony R Martinez and Adam Michael Dwyre
Respondent: Governor of the State of New Mexico and FNU LNU
Case Number: 1:2020cv00317
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Albuquerque Office
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Jessie Romero re #23 Order. (mjr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Ronald Saiz re #23 Order. (mjr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 29 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Freddie Chavez re #23 Order. (mjr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 28 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Eric Apodaca re #23 Order. (mjr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Douglas Cooper re #23 Order. (mjr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Anthony Martinez re #23 Order. (mjr)
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Manuel Soto re #23 Order. (mjr)
May 19, 2020 Filing 24 Letter by Manuel Soto (mjr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Re-Docketing of ECF Nos. #21 and #22 by District Judge Judith C. Herrera. (baw)
May 13, 2020 Filing 22 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION for Reconsideration re #2 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #3 Judgment by Manuel Soto. (mjr) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (mjr).
May 13, 2020 Filing 21 **FILED IN ERROR** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Manuel Soto. (mjr) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (mjr).
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Ronald Saiz re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief. (mjr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Freddie Chavez re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief. (mjr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Eric Apodaca re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Ronald Saiz re #3 Judgment. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Ronald Saiz re #3 Judgment. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Ronald Saiz re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Ronald Saiz re Add and Terminate Judges. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Anthony Martinez re #3 Judgment. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Anthony Martinez re #2 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Anthony Martinez re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Anthony Martinez re Add and Terminate Judges. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Santana Bycck re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Santana Bycck re Add and Terminate Judges. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Eric Apodaca re #3 Judgment. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Eric Apodaca re #2 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (mjr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Petition for 2254 Relief to Eric Apodaca (mjr)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Letter by Manuel Soto (mjr)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 JUDGMENT by District Judge Judith C. Herrera.. (baw)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera dismissing #1 Petition for 2254 Relief for failure to state a federal claim for relief and lack of federal jurisdiction. (baw)
April 9, 2020 United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (ln)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Eric Apodaca, Santana Bycck, Freddie D Chavez, Freddy Chavez, Douglas Cooper, Jonathan Duran, Adam Michael Dwyre, Eric R Ford, Paul Garche, Raymond Hernandez, Omar Herrera, Patrick Hopkins, Manuel Hos, Anthony Jury, Michael Martin, Anthony R Martinez, Matthew Nieto, Ruben Olivas, Charles Robinson, Jessie Romero, Ronald A Saiz, Dainte D Sanders, Donovin Santiago, Manuel Soto, Daniel Joseph Thomas Standley, Adam Stephens, Tyler Treadway, Tyler James Valentino, Raymundo Vargas, Matthew J Zubia. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto et al v. Governor of the State of New Mexico, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dainte D Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ruben Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Omar Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew J Zubia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santana Bycck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald A Saiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymundo Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Garche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donovin Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Nieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyler Treadway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric R Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyler James Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Jury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Hos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Joseph Thomas Standley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddy Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddie D Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony R Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam Michael Dwyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor of the State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?