Atcitty v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Charles James Atcitty
Defendant: USA and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00515
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Charles James Atcitty against United States of America., filed by Charles James Atcitty. (Atcitty, Shenan)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Charles James Atcitty voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Atcitty, Shenan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT Charles James Atcitty against United States of America., filed by Charles James Atcitty. (Atcitty, Shenan) Modified on 7/2/2020 (arp).
June 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 29, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT UNDER THE FEDERAL TORT CLAIMS ACT FOR DAMAGES CAUSED BY NEGLIGENCE against Charles James Atcitty ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Charles James Atcitty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Romero, Joe)
May 28, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7142467 re #1 Complaint, filed by Charles James Atcitty (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Romero, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atcitty v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles James Atcitty
Represented By: Joe M. Romero, Jr.
Represented By: Shenan Rae Atcitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?