Szantho v. Casa Arena Blanca, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andras Szantho
Defendant: New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC, Jeffrey Adisam, Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, THI of New Mexico, LLC and Casa Arena Blanca, LLC doing business as Casa Arena Blanca Nursing Center
Case Number: 1:2020cv00533
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter VACATING the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 3, 2020 and associated deadlines. (plp) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC. (Reyes, Faith)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS JEFFREY ADISAM AND THI OF NEW MEXICO, LLC by Jeffrey Adisam, Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC, THI of New Mexico, LLC (Reyes, Faith)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for August 3, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Counsel shall call the toll-free AT&T conference line at (888) 278-0296, enter access code 9998216, and press # to be joined to the proceedings. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by July 27, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than July 14, 2020. (plp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jeffrey Adisam. (Reyes, Faith)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by THI of New Mexico, LLC. (Reyes, Faith)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC. (Reyes, Faith)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Casa Arena Blanca, LLC. (Reyes, Faith)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jeffrey Adisam, Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC, THI of New Mexico, LLC OF ERRATA (Reyes, Faith)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jeffrey Adisam, Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC, THI of New Mexico, LLC (Reyes, Faith)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial Dist. Santa Fe, State of NM, case number D-101-CV-2020-02221. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Record))(Reyes, Faith)
June 3, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7148908 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Casa Arena Blanca, LLC, New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC, Jeffrey Adisam, THI of New Mexico, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Reyes, Faith)
June 3, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szantho v. Casa Arena Blanca, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Healthcare I, LLC
Represented By: Faith Kalman Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Adisam
Represented By: Faith Kalman Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Arena Blanca, LLC
Represented By: Faith Kalman Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THI of New Mexico, LLC
Represented By: Faith Kalman Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Arena Blanca, LLC doing business as Casa Arena Blanca Nursing Center
Represented By: Faith Kalman Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andras Szantho
Represented By: Brian D. Reddick
Represented By: Brent Lee Moss
Represented By: Ian Norris
Represented By: Lee L Coleman
Represented By: Robert Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?