Picasso Builders, LLC v. Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Picasso Builders, LLC
Defendant: Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. and Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. doing business as RWC Building Products
Case Number: 1:2020cv00539
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Marquez, Chris)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 340 Pecos Courtroom (or via Zoom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. (kc)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Adopting Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan With Changes And Setting Case Management Deadlines.. Discovery due by 3/22/2021; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 10/21/2020; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 11/20/2020; Discovery Motions due by 04/12/2021; Pretrial Motions due by 4/22/2021; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2021; Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2021. (kc)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/23/2020. (kc)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESETTING TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference originally set for 8/7/2020 at 03:00 PM is RESET to 8/6/2020 at 11:00 AM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Resetting Telephone Scheduling Conference. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and rescheduled for 7/23/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (kc)
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Marquez, Chris)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Picasso Builders, LLC Regarding Initial Disclosures (Gooch, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Picasso Builders, LLC Regarding Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery to Defendant (Gooch, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Status Report by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Marquez, Chris)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Trial Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 03:00 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (mm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc., 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Picasso Builders, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. (Marquez, Chris)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Marquez, Chris)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Picasso Builders, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gooch, Christina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Picasso Builders, LLC (Gooch, Christina)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc.. (Marquez, Chris)
June 5, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7153456 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Marquez, Chris)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Marquez, Chris)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/25/2020. (kc)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 4, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc d/b/a RWC Building Products from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-0202-CV-2020-02904. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc d/b/a RWC Building Products. (Marquez, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picasso Builders, LLC v. Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc.
Represented By: Chris R. Marquez
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roofing Wholesale Co., Inc. doing business as RWC Building Products
Represented By: Chris R. Marquez
Represented By: Kurt Wihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picasso Builders, LLC
Represented By: Jesse D. Hale
Represented By: Christina Muscarella Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?