Verdream v. United States Marshel Service et al
Plaintiff: James P. Verdream
Defendant: United States Marshel Service, FNU LNU, Sandoval County Detention Center, U.S. Attorney Office and Devon Fooks
Case Number: 1:2020cv00544
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (gr)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Civil Rights Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Court will enter a separate judgment closing the civil case. (gr)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) days, Plaintiff must prepay the $400 filing fee, or alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Any in forma pauperis motion must attach an inmate account statement reflecting transactions between December 5, 2019 and June 5, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Clerks Office shall send Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (smd)
June 5, 2020 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (ln)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James P. Verdream. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verdream v. United States Marshel Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshel Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoval County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Fooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P. Verdream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?