Parker v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Johnnie V. Parker
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00569
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James A Parker
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Spindle on behalf of United States of America (Spindle, Joseph)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker directing USA to file a response by August 20, 2020 re #3 Amended Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Johnnie V. Parker. (bap)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Amended MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , filed by Johnnie V. Parker. (Elsenheimer, Aric)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Senior District Judge James A. Parker directing Movant Johnnie Parker to file an Amended 2255 Motion with 30 days after entry of this Order. (bap)
June 10, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Johnnie V. Parker. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie V. Parker
Represented By: Aric G. Elsenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?