Gallegos v. The County of Santa Fe et al.
Plaintiff: Darlene Gallegos
Defendant: The County of Santa Fe and John Does
Case Number: 1:2020cv00583
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough VACATING the Scheduling Conference set for 08/13/2020, as well as all corresponding deadlines. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Darlene Gallegos. (Jones, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend (Doc. 11) is granted. Within 5 business days, Plaintiff may file the First Amended Complaint attached to her motion. (kmt)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Amend by Darlene Gallegos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) (Jones, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Darlene Gallegos and 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by The County of Santa Fe. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Darlene Gallegos voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jones, Michael)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than Thursday, July 23, 2020, unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kmt)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), The County of Santa Fe voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Ortiz, Tony)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christa M Hazlett on behalf of The County of Santa Fe (Hazlett, Christa)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The County of Santa Fe (Ortiz, Tony)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 08/13/2020 at 09:30 AM. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929, Access Code: 8865421, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 08/03/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 07/16/2020. (cm)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The County of Santa Fe. (Ortiz, Tony)
June 18, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7172552 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by The County of Santa Fe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ortiz, Tony)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
June 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The County of Santa Fe from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-202000985. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The County of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ortiz, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallegos v. The County of Santa Fe et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Santa Fe
Represented By: Daniel Ross Rubin
Represented By: Tony F Ortiz
Represented By: Eugene I. Zamora
Represented By: Kathy Black
Represented By: Christa M Hazlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Represented By: Daniel Ross Rubin
Represented By: Tony F Ortiz
Represented By: Eugene I. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Gallegos
Represented By: Todd J. Bullion
Represented By: Michael R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?