Sisneros v. Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cinthia Sisneros
Defendant: Regal Cinemas, Inc. and Regal Cinemas, Inc. a Tennessee Corporation doing business as Regal Winrock Stadium 16 IMAX and RPX
Case Number: 1:2020cv00624
Filed: June 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough (kfo)
January 22, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Kugler, Aaron)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Having been informed of the parties settlement of this case, the Court VACATES the settlement conference set for January 14, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (Docs. 14, 20.) The parties are to file closing documents within 60 days of this Order. (glg)
January 4, 2021 Filing 24 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference held on 1/4/2021. (glg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cinthia Sisneros of Plaintiff's 1st Request for Admissions to Defendant (Thiel, Albert)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Expert Disclosures (Kugler, Aaron)
November 27, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cinthia Sisneros of Plaintiff's Answers to Defendant's First Interrog and RFP (Thiel, Albert)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONVERTING IN-PERSON SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM AND FOR PARTIES TO PROVIDE ZOOM CONTACT INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the need for social distancing, the Court will hold the Rule 16 Settlement Conference in this case, which is set for 1/14/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Khalsa (Doc. 14), REMOTELY VIA ZOOM. Each party shall include in its confidential position statement to the Court the e-mail addresses and phone numbers for all persons who will participate in the settlement conference on the party's behalf. This contact information will be used to send the participants Zoom invitations to attend the conference. If any participant lacks the ability to attend the conference via Zoom, each party must include that information in its confidential position statement as well. Participants should connect to the proceeding fifteen (15) minutes before it is scheduled to start to allow enough time to resolve any connectivity issues. ***Recording or broadcasting any part of this conference is strictly prohibited.***[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (glg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Defendant's First Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production (Kugler, Aaron)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Defendant's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff (Kugler, Aaron)
September 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Regal Cinemas, Inc.'s Disovery Answers (Kugler, Aaron)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Kugler, Aaron)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 1/14/2021 at 09:30 AM in Albuquerque - 440 Hondo Courtroom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 1/4/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendant by 12/21/2020. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 12/30/2020. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 12/31/2020. (kys)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join parties and amend pleadings by September 30, 2020. Defendant to seek leave to join parties and amend pleadings by October 30, 2020. Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures due by October 19, 2020. Defendant's expert witness disclosures due by December 18, 2020. Discovery to be completed by February 8, 2021. Discovery motions to be filed by March 1, 2021. Pretrial motions to be filed by March 11, 2021. Proposed pretrial order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by April 26, 2021 and from Defendant to the Court by May 10, 2021. (kys)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference held on 8/11/2020. (kys)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Cinthia Sisneros, 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Regal Cinemas, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kugler, Aaron)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Regal Cinemas, Inc. (Kugler, Aaron)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cinthia Sisneros of Initial Disclosures (Thiel, Albert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regal Cinemas, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Kugler, Aaron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Regal Cinemas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kugler, Aaron)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Cinthia Sisneros voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Thiel, Albert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Kugler, Aaron)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2020. Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter Code: 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/6/2020. (kys)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 29, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
June 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regal Cinemas, Inc. from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-03182. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kugler, Aaron)
June 27, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7186678 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Regal Cinemas, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kugler, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisneros v. Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Cinemas, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Cinemas, Inc. a Tennessee Corporation doing business as Regal Winrock Stadium 16 IMAX and RPX
Represented By: Aaron Randall Kugler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia Sisneros
Represented By: Albert N. Thiel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?