Ferrara v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Ferrara
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00650
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Modifying and Re-Setting Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment to be filed 11/2/2020. Defendant's Response and and cross-motion due 12/2/2020. Plaintiff's Reply and any Response to Defendant due 1/5/2021. Defendant's reply due 1/19/2021. (smd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar: Scheduling Conference held on 8/25/2020. (smd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Status Report Defendants portion by Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Lucero, Manuel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Status Report by Victoria Ferrara (Ferrara, Victoria)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 7 and 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint Requesting FOIA relief by Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Victoria Ferrara.(Lucero, Manuel)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 8/25/2020 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/6/2020. (smd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Department of Homeland Security (Lucero, Manuel)
July 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 2, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (dr)
July 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7194548 re 1 Complaint filed by Victoria Ferrara (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Ferrara, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Ferrara
Represented By: Victoria Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?