Batis v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Tana Batis
Defendant: Serta Simmons Bedding LLC, National Bedding Company LLC., Serta Inc., Joe Fabian Perez, ABC Company Unknown Employer and Serta Mattress Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00676
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by September 14, 2020. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for October 5, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/25/2020. (jcm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on August 3, 2020. (jcm)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for August 3, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Serta, Inc., National Bedding Company, Serta Simmons Bedding LLC, Joe Fabian Perez, Serta Mattress Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2019-02186. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Serta, Inc., National Bedding Company, Serta Simmons Bedding LLC, Joe Fabian Perez, Serta Mattress Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Fields, Tim)
July 9, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7203076 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Serta Simmons Bedding LLC, National Bedding Company, Serta Mattress Company, Serta, Inc., Joe Fabian Perez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Fields, Tim)
July 9, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batis v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serta Simmons Bedding LLC
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Bedding Company LLC.
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serta Inc.
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Fabian Perez
Represented By: Bayard Roberts,
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company Unknown Employer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serta Mattress Company
Represented By: Tim L Fields
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tana Batis
Represented By: Alvin R. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?