Aschenbrenner v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Vivian Aschenbrenner
Defendant: US Department of Energy, Sandia National Laboratories, National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC, United States of America and Honeywell International
Case Number: 1:2020cv00797
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS on Amended Complaint Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner; U.S. Department of Energy served 9/29/20; answer due 10/20/20. (Carpenter, Frances) Modified text on 10/6/2020 (bap).
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. US Department of Energy served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Carpenter, Frances)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. United States of America served on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Carpenter, Frances) Modified answer due date since it is a USA on 9/30/2020 (bap).
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Carpenter, Frances)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. Honeywell International served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Carpenter, Frances)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. Sandia National Laboratories served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Carpenter, Frances)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE by District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal. (anl)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Vivian Aschenbrenner Notice of Unavailability (Carpenter, Frances)
September 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants., filed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. (Carpenter, Frances)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Vivian Aschenbrenner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Frances)
August 10, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7250337 re #1 Complaint filed by Vivian Aschenbrenner (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Carpenter, Frances)
August 10, 2020 United States District Judge Nancy D. Freudenthal and United States Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aschenbrenner v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandia National Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Technology and Engineering Solutions of Sandia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Aschenbrenner
Represented By: Veronica Dorato
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?