Kiser et al v. Air Methods Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Christian McClain and Charles Kiser
Defendant: Air Methods Corporation and Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00801
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Charles Kiser Amended Notice of Association of Out of District Attorney Ed L. White (Kramer, David)
September 5, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7294554 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Charles Kiser (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kramer, David)
September 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Charles Kiser of Associate of Out of District Attorney Ed L. White (Kramer, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Charles Kiser by David C Kramer on behalf of: Ed White Ed White, P.C. 829 East 33rd StreetEdmond, Oklahoma 73013 (405) 810-8188 Fax (405) 608-0971 ed@edwhitelaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Kramer, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Kiser as to Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC. (Kramer, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles Kiser as to Air Methods Corporation. (Kramer, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J Smith on behalf of Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC (Montano, Larry) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (mjr).
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC re 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Member Attorneys Certification In Support Of Appearance Pro Hac Vice By Out Of State Counsel - Jessica J. Smith (Montano, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7267657 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Montano, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC by Larry J Montano on behalf of: Jessica J. Smith Holland & Hart LLP 555 17th Street, Suite 3200Denver, CO 80202 303-295-8374 Fax 303-974-1133 JJSmith@hollandhart.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Montano, Larry)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Smith on behalf of All Defendants (Montano, Larry) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (mjr).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Member Attorneys Certificate In Support Of Appearance Pro Hac Vice Out Of State Counsel - Matthew J. Smith (Montano, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7267566 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Montano, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC by Larry J Montano on behalf of: Matthew J. Smith Holland & Hart LLP 555 17th St., Suite 3200Denver, CO 80202 303-295-8010 Fax 303-295-8261 MJSmith@hollandhart.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Montano, Larry)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Charles Kiser. (Kramer, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number ANMDC-7251857 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Charles Kiser (Kramer, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 11, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Charles Kiser. (Kramer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiser et al v. Air Methods Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian McClain
Represented By: David C Kramer
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kiser
Represented By: David C Kramer
Represented By: Edward L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Methods Corporation
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Represented By: Julia Broggi
Represented By: Matthew J Smith
Represented By: Larry J Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Smith
Represented By: Julia Broggi
Represented By: Matthew J Smith
Represented By: Larry J Montano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?