Cisneros Design, Inc. v. County of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Plaintiff: Cisneros Design, Inc.
Defendant: Santa Fe County, Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The and County of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Case Number: 1:2020cv00818
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The as to Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The. (Roman, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 10/27/2020 at 03:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 10/20/2020. (mlt)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The (Roman, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Report re: copyright. (arp)
September 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to The Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe on Amended Complaint. (dr)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Cisneros Design, Inc., against Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The. adding Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The and Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The. terminating County of Santa Fe, New Mexico., filed by Cisneros Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 15, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Katherine Miller, #2 Exhibit B - June 26, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Anna Hansen, #3 Exhibit C - Santa Fe County Comparison Logos)(Pottow, Michael)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #12 Motion to Amend (kfo)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Copyright Infringement by Cisneros Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Pottow, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by County of Santa Fe, New Mexico, 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Cisneros Design, Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Cisneros Design, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Pottow, Michael)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Opposed MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by County of Santa Fe, New Mexico. (Huss, Brandon)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), County of Santa Fe, New Mexico voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Huss, Brandon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Huss on behalf of County of Santa Fe, New Mexico (Huss, Brandon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisneros Design, Inc.. County of Santa Fe, New Mexico served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Pottow, Michael)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number SF003339 re #1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Santa Fe County ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Cisneros Design, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - June 15, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Katherine Miller, # 2 Exhibit B - June 26, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Anna Hansen, # 3 Exhibit C - Santa Fe County Logos Comparison, # 4 Rule 71 Disclosure Statement, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pottow, Michael) filed by Cisneros Design, Inc. (gr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Report re: copyright (dr)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 14, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
August 14, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 6 (Santa Fe) to 1 (Albuquerque). (dr)
August 14, 2020 Summons Issued as to County of Santa Fe, New Mexico. (dr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Santa Fe County ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by Cisneros Design, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 15, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Katherine Miller, #2 Exhibit B - June 26, 2017 Email from Fred Cisneros to Anna Hansen, #3 Exhibit C - Santa Fe County Logos Comparison, #4 Rule 71 Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pottow, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisneros Design, Inc. v. County of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisneros Design, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Pottow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of County of Santa Fe, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Fe, New Mexico
Represented By: Mark L. Drebing
Represented By: Brandon Huss
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?