Buildology, Inc. v. Union Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Buildology, Inc.
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00825
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Telephonic Status Conference to discuss the scheduling of a Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 4/5/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 11/2/2020. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend by 11/30/2020. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 2/10/2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 3/12/2021. Discovery due by 4/23/2021. Discovery motions due by 5/13/2021. Pretrial motions due by 5/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendant by 8/3/2021 and from Defendant to the Court by 8/17/2021. (kmt)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/21/2020. (kmt)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tim Delabar on behalf of Union Insurance Company (Delabar, Tim)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Union Insurance Company (Wilson, Lisa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Buildology, Inc., 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Union Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Buildology, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Branch, Brian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Union Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Wilson, Lisa)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Buildology, Inc. (Jones, William)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Union Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 8/31/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 9/11/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/15/2020. (kmt)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Union Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wilson, Lisa) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (cer).
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Union Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Wilson, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Union Insurance Company. (Wilson, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7261070 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Union Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wilson, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Union Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-03167. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Documents Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Wilson, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buildology, Inc. v. Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buildology, Inc.
Represented By: William Truman Jones, Jr
Represented By: Brian K. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Wilson
Represented By: Tim Delabar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?