Forth v. Martinez
Petitioner: Shawn Forth
Respondent: Leon Martinez
Case Number: 1:2020cv00832
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn Forth. (meq)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shawn Forth. (meq)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. By 09/25/2020, Petitioner must: (1) file a 2254 petition on the official form; (2) prepay the $5 fee or, alternatively, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; and (3) show-cause in writing why any 2254 claims are not time-barred. (cm)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE for recommended findings and final disposition to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough by District Judge James O. Browning (vv)
August 19, 2020 United States District Judge James O. Browning and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shawn Forth. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forth v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leon Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn Forth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?