Balderas v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico ex rel Hector Balderas, Attorney General and Hector Balderas
Defendant: Chattem Inc., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, Fred Meyer, Inc., APPCO PHARMA LLC, NOVITIUM PHARMA LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC., COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP., GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., APOTEX CORP., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co., Walmart Inc., Target Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, STRIDES PHARMA, INC., PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., LANNETT COMPANY, INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC., TELIGENT, INC., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., SANDOZ INC., The Kroger Co., Pfizer Inc. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00833
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kea W Riggs
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. re #14 MOTION to Stay Defendants filed by Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Garcia, Monica)
September 18, 2020 Filing 100 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Defendants filed by Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co.. (Garcia, Monica)
September 18, 2020 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc. (Montano, Larry)
September 18, 2020 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apotex Corp. (Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE by Strides Pharma, Inc. Filing Records and Proceedings of State Court Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing Records and Proceedings of State Court Action Part 1, #2 Exhibit A to Notice of Filing Records and Proceedings of State Court Action Part 2) (Crown, Ross)
September 17, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE by Apotex Corp. (Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7313503 re: # 94 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Apotex Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7313490 re: # 95 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Apotex Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 95 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Apotex Corp. by Stephen Shanor on behalf of: Ann Querns Blank Rome 130 N 18th St.Philadelphia PA 19103 215-569-5674 Fax 215-832-5674 aquerns@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Shanor, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 94 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Apotex Corp. by Stephen Shanor on behalf of: Terry Henry Blank Rome 130 N 18th StreetPhiladelphia, PA 19103 215-569-5674 Fax 215-832-5674 thenry@blankrome.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Shanor, Stephen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Shanor on behalf of Apotex Corp. (Shanor, Stephen)
September 17, 2020 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perrigo Research & Development Company (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Inc. (Allison, Benjamin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corp. (Parekh, Niraj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. (Parekh, Niraj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Parekh, Niraj)
September 16, 2020 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Parekh, Niraj)
September 15, 2020 Filing 86 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sandoz Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG, a Swiss company, whose shares are publicly traded on the SIX Swiss Exchange, and whose American Depository Shares are publicly traded on the New York Stock Exchange for Sandoz Inc.. (Stanford, Meghan)
September 11, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE by Pfizer Inc. re 80 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 81 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification of Good Standing (Allison, Benjamin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA, Corporate Parent Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Limited for Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. (Harvey, Holly)
September 11, 2020 Filing 83 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. by Jeff Joseph Davis, I on behalf of: Sarah E. Johnston Barnes & Thornburg LLP 2029 Century Park East, Suite 300Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904 310 284 3880 Fax 310 284 3894 sjohnston@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Davis, Jeff)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 82 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. by Jeff Joseph Davis, I on behalf of: Niraj J. Parekh Barnes & Thornburg LLP 445 Park Avenue, Suite 700New York, NY 10022-8634 646 746 2000 Fax 646 746 2001 nparekh@btlaw.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Davis, Jeff)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 10, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7301473 re: # 81 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Pfizer Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
September 10, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number BNMDC-7301416 re: # 80 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Pfizer Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allison, Benjamin)
September 10, 2020 Filing 81 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Annie E. Showalter Williams & Connolly LLP 725 Twelfth Street, NWWashington, DC 20005 202-434-5841 Fax 202-434-5029 ashowalter@wc.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 80 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom Williams & Connolly LLP 725 Twelfth Street, NWWashington, DC 20005 202-434-5567 Fax 202-434-5029 JRydstrom@wc.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Allison, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. (Garrett, Sean)
September 10, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Allison, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lannett Company, Inc. (Rosales, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7299162 re: # 75 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rosales, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 75 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Lannett Company, Inc. by Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr on behalf of: Allison L Hollows Fox Rothschild LLP 101 Park Avenue 17th FloorNew York, NY 10178 (212) 878-7900 Fax (212) 692-0940 ahollows@foxrothschild.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rosales, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 9, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7299126 re: # 74 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rosales, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 74 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Lannett Company, Inc. by Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr on behalf of: Maura Burke Fox Rothschild LLP 2000 Market Street, 20th FloorPhiladelphia, PA 19104 (215) 299-2872 Fax (215) 299-2150 MBurke@foxrothschild.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rosales, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 9, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7299101 re: # 73 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Lannett Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rosales, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 73 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Lannett Company, Inc. by Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr on behalf of: Eileen Oakes Muskett Fox Rothschild LLP 1301 Atlantic Ave. #400Atlantic City, NJ (609) 572-2355 Fax (609) 348-6824 EMuskett@foxrothschild.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rosales, Daniel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Lannett Company, Inc. Certification of Good Standing for Appearance of Non-Member Attorney by Association (Rosales, Daniel)
September 9, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Michael Rosales, Jr on behalf of Lannett Company, Inc. (Rosales, Daniel)
September 8, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Hector Balderas re #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hector Balderas (Rael, Marcus)
September 8, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hector Balderas. (Rael, Marcus)
September 8, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. re 67 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 66 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certification of Good Standing (Harvey, Holly)
September 8, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7295523 re: # 67 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Harvey, Holly)
September 8, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7295519 re: # 66 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Harvey, Holly)
September 8, 2020 Filing 67 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. by Holly R Harvey on behalf of: Megan B. Gramke Ulmer Berne LLP 600 Vine Street, Suite 2800Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 (513) 698-5146 mgramke@ulmer.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Harvey, Holly)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 66 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. by Holly R Harvey on behalf of: John Isparo Ulmer & Berne LLP 600 Vine Street, Suite 2800Cincinnati, OH 45202 (513) 698-5104 jipsaro@ulmer.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Harvey, Holly)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay Defendants Motion to Stay proceedings pending transfer to MDL filed by Hector Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rael, Marcus)
September 4, 2020 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Strides Pharma, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Strides Pharma Inc.'s Response in Opposition, #2 Exhibit B to Strides Pharma Inc.'s Response in Opposition) (Crown, Ross)
September 3, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Veronica N. Lewis on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc. (Lewis, Veronica)
September 3, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Burris, Eric)
September 3, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Burris on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Burris, Eric)
September 1, 2020 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Hernandez, Jessica)
September 1, 2020 Filing 59 **FILED IN ERROR** Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc.(Hernandez, Jessica) Modified on 9/2/2020 (filed in error per attorney Hernandez)(cmm).
September 1, 2020 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. (Hernandez, Jessica)
September 1, 2020 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem Inc. (Hernandez, Jessica)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending dispositive motions (Docs. 14,17). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (ccp)
September 1, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7286004 re: # 55 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Sandoz Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stanford, Meghan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 55 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Sandoz Inc. by Meghan Dimond Stanford on behalf of: Donald R. McMinn Hollingsworth, LLP 1350 I Street NWWashington, DC 20005 202-898-5875 dmcminn@hollingsworthllp.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stanford, Meghan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 31, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7285253 re: # 54 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Target Corporation, Walgreens Co., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Parekh, Niraj)
August 31, 2020 Filing 54 **FILED IN ERROR**ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. by Niraj Parekh (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Parekh, Niraj)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 9/1/2020 (dr).
August 31, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7284766 re: # 53 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Costco Wholesale Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Target Corporation, Walgreens Co., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Johnston, Sarah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 53 **FILED IN ERROR**ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. by Sarah Johnston (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Johnston, Sarah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified on 9/1/2020 (dr).
August 31, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Echtman, Elyse)
August 31, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Elyse Echtman on behalf of ANI Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Echtman, Elyse)
August 31, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. Cert of Good Standing of Donald R. McMinn (Stanford, Meghan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Dimond Stanford on behalf of Sandoz Inc. (Stanford, Meghan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA identifying Corporate Parent GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA, Corporate Parent Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. (Walker, Alex)
August 28, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Hector Balderas re #23 Opposed MOTION to Expedite The State of New Mexico's Motion to Remand filed by Hector Balderas (Rael, Marcus)
August 28, 2020 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Opposed MOTION to Expedite The State of New Mexico's Motion to Remand filed by Hector Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Rael, Marcus)
August 28, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. of Certificate of Good Standing for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Davis, Jeff)
August 28, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff Joseph Davis, I on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Target Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co. (Davis, Jeff)
August 28, 2020 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Blake, Neil)
August 28, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fred Meyer, Inc. (Blake, Neil)
August 28, 2020 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co. (Blake, Neil)
August 27, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Opposed MOTION to Expedite The State of New Mexico's Motion to Remand filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Hector Balderas re 37 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, D.N.M.LR-CIV 83.3 Certification of Good Standing (Rael, Marcus)
August 26, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Hector Balderas re 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, D.N.M.LR-CIV 83.3 Certification of Good Standing (Rael, Marcus)
August 26, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7277726 re: # 37 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rael, Marcus)
August 26, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7277699 re: # 35 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Hector Balderas (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rael, Marcus)
August 26, 2020 Filing 37 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Marcus J Rael, Jr on behalf of: Laina M. Herbert Grant & Eisenhofer P.A 123 Justison StreetWilmington, Delaware, 19801 302.622.7016 lherbert@gelaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rael, Marcus)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 26, 2020 Filing 35 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Hector Balderas by Marcus J Rael, Jr on behalf of: Kyle J. McGee Grant & Eisenhofer P.A 123 Justison StreetWilmington, Delaware, 19801 302.622.7058 kmcgee@gelaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Rael, Marcus)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE by Perrigo Research & Development Company re 32 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 30 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 31 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Certificate of Good Standing for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Croasdell, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. McMath on behalf of Hector Balderas (McMath, Brian)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275829 re: # 32 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Perrigo Research & Development Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Croasdell, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275807 re: # 31 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Perrigo Research & Development Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Croasdell, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275784 re: # 30 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Perrigo Research & Development Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Croasdell, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2020 Filing 32 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Perrigo Research & Development Company by Jeffrey M. Croasdell on behalf of: K. Nichole Nesbitt Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP One South Street, 20th FloorBaltimore, Maryland 21202 410-783-4000 knn@gdldlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Croasdell, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 31 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Perrigo Research & Development Company by Jeffrey M. Croasdell on behalf of: Linda S. Woolf Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP One South Street, 20th floor Baltimore, Maryland, 21202 410-783-4000 lswgdldlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Croasdell, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Perrigo Research & Development Company by Jeffrey M. Croasdell on behalf of: Richard M. Barnes Goodell, DeVries, Leech & Dann, LLP One South Street, 20th FloorBaltimre, Maryland, 21202 410-83-4000 rmb@gdldlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Croasdell, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275036 re: # 29 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275028 re: # 28 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275016 re: # 27 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7275000 re: # 26 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 25, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7274966 re: # 25 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Chattem Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Jessica)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Paige H. Sharpe Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LP 601 Massachusetts Avenue NWWashintgon, DC 20001 (202) 942-5000 paige.sharpe@arnoldporter.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 28 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Daniel S. Pariser Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LP 601 Massachusetts Avenue NWWashintgon, DC 20001 (202) 942-5000 daniel.pariser@arnoldporter.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 27 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Anand Agneshwar Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LP 250 West 55th StreetNew York, New York 10019 (212) 836-8000 anand.agneshwar@arnoldporter.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 26 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Jeff Tsai DLA Piper LLP (US) 555 Mission Street, Suite 2400San Francisco, California 94105 (415) 615-6055 jeff.tsai@dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of: Ilana H: Eisenstein DLA Piper LLP (US) 1650 Market Street, Suite 5000Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 215-656-3351 ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Hernandez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Chattem Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Hernandez, Jessica)
August 24, 2020 Filing 23 Opposed MOTION to Expedite The State of New Mexico's Motion to Remand by Hector Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Rael, Marcus)
August 24, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strides Pharma, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Strides Pharma Science Limited for Strides Pharma, Inc.. (Crown, Ross)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED. (ve)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 18 Association Dues: $ 100 paid, receipt number # ALB047582 re: 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Defendant The Kroger Co., Defendant Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., Defendant Fred Meyer, Inc. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Hector Balderas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Rael, Marcus)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus J Rael, Jr on behalf of Hector Balderas (Rael, Marcus)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica M Hernandez on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Hernandez, Jessica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Defendants by Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Garcia, Monica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR-ATTORNEY WILL BE FILING AN ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL COUNSEL***NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Nichole Nesbitt on behalf of Perrigo Research & Development Company (Nesbitt, Kristen) Modified on 8/24/2020 (aek).
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Judith C. Herrera no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Garcia, Monica)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. by Monica R Garcia on behalf of: Fredrick H. L. McClure Trenam Law 101 East Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 2700Tampa, FL 33602 813-227-7425 Fax 813-229-6553 fmcclure@trenam.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Garcia, Monica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR-ATTORNEY WILL BE FILING AN ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL COUNSEL***NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Barnes on behalf of Perrigo Research & Development Company (Barnes, Richard) Modified on 8/24/2020 (aek).
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G. Petrosinelli on behalf of Pfizer Inc. (Petrosinelli, Joseph )
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Walmart Inc. Notice of Appearance by Larry J. Montano and Julia Broggi of Holland & Hart LLP on behalf of WalMart, Inc. (Montano, Larry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of Fred Meyer, Inc., Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., The Kroger Co. (Garcia, Monica)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek) Modified on 8/21/2020 (arp).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 20, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (arp)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 19, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7266075 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by STRIDES PHARMA, INC. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Crown, Ross)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STRIDES PHARMA, INC. from First Judicial District Court, County of Santa Fe, New Mexico, case number D-101-CV-2020-01289. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by STRIDES PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Crown, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balderas v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Jessica M Hernandez
Represented By: Jeff Tsai
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Represented By: Ilana H. Eisenstein
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: Veronica N. Lewis
Represented By: Holly R Harvey
Represented By: Audra Davie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Meyer, Inc.
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Represented By: Fredrick H.L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPCO PHARMA LLC
Represented By: Jordan S. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVITIUM PHARMA LLC
Represented By: Mary Holly Colvin Herring
Represented By: Scott Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Jessica M Hernandez
Represented By: Jeff Tsai
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Represented By: Ilana H. Eisenstein
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Daniel S. Pariser
Represented By: Jessica M Hernandez
Represented By: Jeff Tsai
Represented By: Paige H. Sharpe
Represented By: Ilana H. Eisenstein
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Elyse Echtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. REDDYS LABORATORIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS INC., USA
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC
Represented By: Eric R. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOTEX CORP.
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Represented By: Stephen Shanor
Represented By: Ann Querns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Larry J Montano
Represented By: Julia Broggi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STRIDES PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Ross L Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRIGO RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: K. Nichole Nesbitt
Represented By: Richard M. Barnes
Represented By: Linda Semesky Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Jeff Joseph Davis
Represented By: Niraj Parekh
Represented By: Sarah Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANNETT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Allison L. Hollows
Represented By: Daniel M. Rosales
Represented By: Maura Burke
Represented By: Eileen Oakes Muskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA, INC.
Represented By: Sean E Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELIGENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Represented By: Fredrick H.L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Monica R Garcia
Represented By: Fredrick H.L. McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Annie E. Showalter
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Benjamin W Allison
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Ipsaro
Represented By: Audra Davie
Represented By: Megan B. Gramke
Represented By: Holly R Harvey
Represented By: Veronica N. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico ex rel Hector Balderas, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Kyle J McGee
Represented By: Cholla Khoury
Represented By: Laina M. Herbert
Represented By: Brian E. McMath
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?