Davidson Oil Company v. City of Albuquerque
Plaintiff: Davidson Oil Company
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Case Number: 1:2020cv00838
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque (DuBois, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque (DuBois, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque (DuBois, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Davidson Oil Company as to City of Albuquerque. (Crown, Ross)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davidson Oil Company (Crown, Ross)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Albuquerque ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Davidson Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crown, Ross)
August 21, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7269947 re #1 Complaint filed by Davidson Oil Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Crown, Ross)
August 21, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
August 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to City of Albuquerque. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson Oil Company v. City of Albuquerque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: John E. DuBois
Represented By: Kristin J Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davidson Oil Company
Represented By: Ross L Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?