B.L.M.W. Corporation v. Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.
Plaintiff: B.L.M.W. Corporation
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00846
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 3/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 7/13/2021. (kfo)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2020. (kfo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Keller, Courtenay)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Status Report by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. (Keller, Courtenay)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by B.L.M.W. Corporation (Jones, William)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/22/2020. (kfo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.. (Keller, Courtenay)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtenay L Keller on behalf of Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. (Keller, Courtenay)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 24, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.. (Keller, Courtenay)
August 24, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7272424 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Keller, Courtenay)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD. from Second Judicial District Court, County of Bernalillo, State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2020-04184. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Courtenay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B.L.M.W. Corporation v. Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.
Represented By: Justin R Woolf
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Represented By: Drew Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.L.M.W. Corporation
Represented By: William Truman Jones, Jr
Represented By: Brian K. Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?