Peterson v. Kunkel et al
Plaintiff: Douglas H. Peterson
Defendant: Michelle Lujan Grisham and Kathyleen M. Kunkel
Not Classified By Court: United States
Case Number: 1:2020cv00898
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
2 Judge: William P Johnson
3 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 35 RULE 58 JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
October 22, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Granting in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (meq)
October 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
October 13, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Douglas H. Peterson. (Buchanan, Deena)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 10/15/2020. (cmm)
October 6, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Douglas H. Peterson. (Buchanan, Deena)
October 2, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson, Denying #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Except for the Equal Protection Claim Which is Denied Without Prejudice. (meq)
October 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Michelle Lujan Grisham, Kathyleen M. Kunkel of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Garcia, Matthew)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson denying #24 Motion to Seal (meq)
September 23, 2020 Filing 26 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas H. Peterson. (Court Reporter M. Loughran) (meq)
September 23, 2020 Filing 25 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/29/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 11/5/2020 at 02:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ke)
September 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal by Douglas H. Peterson. (Buchanan, Deena)
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas H. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johns Hopkins Report, #2 Exhibit AA Contract redacted student info and address) (Buchanan, Deena)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Kathyleen M. Kunkel, Michelle Lujan Grisham. Defendants are authorized to file their motion to dismiss in excess of the page limit up to 32 pages. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (rwg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michelle Lujan Grisham, Kathyleen M. Kunkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Garcia, Matthew)
September 22, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michelle Lujan Grisham, Kathyleen M. Kunkel. (Garcia, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF Statement of Interest by United States (Treene, Eric)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Treene on behalf of United States (Treene, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Michelle Lujan Grisham, Kathyleen M. Kunkel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Garcia, Matthew)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (meq)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Michelle Lujan Grisham, Kathyleen M. Kunkel. (Garcia, Matthew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Garcia on behalf of All Defendants (Garcia, Matthew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Docs 3-11 on Def. Gov. Lujan Grisham by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Docs 3-11 on Def. Kunkel by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena) Modified text on 9/17/2020 per attorneys request (kg).
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER FOR RESPONSE BY DEFENDANTS re #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2020 at 1:30 PM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom - Remote before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (rwg)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Service on Def. Lujan Grisham by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Service on Def. Kunkel by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Information Sheet for T.R.O. by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service (Defendant (Governor Michelle Lujan Grisham) by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service (Def. Kunkel) by Douglas H. Peterson (Buchanan, Deena)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing and Order re #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 1:30 PM in Albuquerque - 560 Cimarron Courtroom - Remote before Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (rwg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack and Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl, Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Douglas H. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7) (Buchanan, Deena)
September 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to Michelle Lujan Grisham, and Kathyleen M. Kunkel. (aek)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Rights Violations Seeking Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Douglas H. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Buchanan, Deena)
September 1, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7287258 re #1 Complaint, filed by Douglas H. Peterson (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Buchanan, Deena)
September 1, 2020 United States District Judge Scott W. Skavdahl and United States Magistrate Judge Mark L. Carman assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Kunkel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Lujan Grisham
Represented By: Matthew L. Garcia
Represented By: Maria S. Dudley
Represented By: Kyle P Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathyleen M. Kunkel
Represented By: Matthew L. Garcia
Represented By: Maria S. Dudley
Represented By: Kyle P Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas H. Peterson
Represented By: Deena L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: United States
Represented By: Eric Treene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?