Doe v. Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs
Plaintiff: John Doe 195 and John Doe
Defendant: Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs
Case Number: 1:2020cv00908
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe 195 of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant (Hall, Brad)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AMENDING #18 Initial Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. The parties have already submitted a Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan ("JSR") (Doc. 14). Accordingly, the parties do not need to meet and confer or submit a second JSR. The Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 18) is amended only to set a Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/4/2020 at 02:45 PM in Albuquerque. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (cda)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/4/2020 at 02:45 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 10/28/2020. (cda)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ng)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set in #4 Initial Scheduling Order for 10/27/2020 at 01:30 PM is VACATED. It will be reset by the Court at a later date. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs of INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Mason, Patrick)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Status Report by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs (Mason, Patrick)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Hall, Brad)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 8 and 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. District Judge Judith C. Herrera no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs (Mason, Patrick)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs (Mason, Patrick)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs (Collins, Bobbie)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/29/2020. (kfo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 4, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs. (Mason, Patrick)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs from Second Judicial District Court County of Bernalillo, State of New Mexico, case number D-202-CV-2020-04825. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mason, Patrick)
September 3, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7292655 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mason, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisters of Saint Francis of Colorado Springs
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Mason
Represented By: Bobbie Jo Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 195
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Brad D. Hall
Represented By: Levi Albert Monagle
Represented By: Lisa P. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?