Olivas v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathy Olivas
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00936
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Thayne Warner on behalf of Social Security Administration (Warner, Marc)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Kathy Olivas and 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Social Security Administration. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Social Security Administration voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lucero, Manuel)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel)
September 23, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number ANMDC-7308452 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Kathy Olivas voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Decker, Benjamin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 15, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Kathy Olivas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Decker, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivas v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Olivas
Represented By: Benjamin Eilers Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Represented By: Marc Thayne Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?