Escovedo v. Darden Concepts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lorie Escovedo
Defendant: Darden Concepts, Inc. and Darden Concepts, Inc. a Florida For-Profit Corporation doing business as Cheddar's Scratch Kitchen
Case Number: 1:2020cv00943
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darden Concepts, Inc. of Defendant's Responses to Discovery (Najjar, Jared)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Judge Yarbrough's AT&T Conference line number has changed. The parties should dial the new number, (888) 398-2342 [Access Code 2418431], to connect to the proceedings on 02/23/2021 at 10:30 AM. This order does not make any other changes to the scheduled conference.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough: Scheduling Conference held on 10/29/2020. (cm)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough setting a Telephonic Status Conference for 02/23/2021 at 10:30 AM. The purpose of this conference is to discuss setting a settlement conference. The parties shall call the AT&T Conference line at (888) 808-6929 [Access Code: 8865421] to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cm)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Discovery due by 05/28/2021. Discovery Motions due by 06/21/2021. Pretrial Motions due by 06/28/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/12/2021. (cm)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Darden Concepts, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Najjar, Jared)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lorie Escovedo (Messerer, Leigh)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report by Darden Concepts, Inc. (Najjar, Jared)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lorie Escovedo, 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Darden Concepts, Inc.. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Darden Concepts, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Najjar, Jared)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Lorie Escovedo voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Messerer, Leigh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 at 09:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/08/2020. (cm)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 17, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7314101 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Darden Concepts, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Najjar, Jared)
September 17, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Darden Concepts, Inc.. (Najjar, Jared)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Darden Concepts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Darden Corporation, Corporate Parent Darden Restaurants, Inc for Darden Concepts, Inc.. (Najjar, Jared)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Darden Concepts, Inc. from 1st Judicial District, County of Santa fe, case number D-101-CV-2020-1644. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Darden Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Najjar, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escovedo v. Darden Concepts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorie Escovedo
Represented By: Leigh Messerer
Represented By: Linda G Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Concepts, Inc. a Florida For-Profit Corporation doing business as Cheddar's Scratch Kitchen
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?