Oveide v. Central New Mexico Correctional Facility
Plaintiff: Anthony Oveide
Defendant: Central New Mexico Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2020cv00976
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony Oveide (bc)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915, DIRECTING Plaintiff to make the initial partial payment no later than December 11, 2020, and DIRECTING the Clerk to send copies. (rcf)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Oveide. (yc)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis no later than November 10, 2020. (rcf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to the Court by Mr. Oveide (yc)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Central New Mexico Correctional Facility, filed by Anthony Oveide. (ln)
September 23, 2020 United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oveide v. Central New Mexico Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oveide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central New Mexico Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?