Griffin et al v. Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Griffin and Mary Griffin
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01009
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 3/9/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 2/26/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiffs' demand letter is due to Defendant by 2/12/2021. Defendant's counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 2/22/2021. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 2/24/2021. (kmt)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiffs to seek leave to join and amend by 12/30/2020. Defendant to seek leave to join and amend by 1/13/2021. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 3/22/2021. Defendant's expert disclosures due by 4/19/2021. Discovery due by 6/28/2021. Discovery motions due by 7/19/2021. Pretrial motions due by 7/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiffs to Defendant by 9/21/2021 and from Defendants to the Court by 10/5/2021. (kmt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2020. (kmt)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc. Certificate of Service for Initial Disclosures (Prince-Loyd, Melanie )
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc. (Prince-Loyd, Melanie )
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Williams, Patricia)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Equifax Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.. (Williams, Patricia)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 10/19/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 10/30/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/9/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/4/2020. (kmt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 2, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
October 2, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7339528 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Williams, Patricia)
October 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7339511 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Williams, Patricia)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Equifax Information Services LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Good Standing of Melanie Prince-Loyd (Williams, Patricia)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Patricia Williams on behalf of: Melanie A. Prince-Loyd Seyfarth Shaw LLP 121 West Trade Street, Suite 2020Charlotte, NC 28202 704 925-6029 mprince-loyd@seyfarth.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Williams, Patricia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Williams, Patricia)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equifax Information Services LLC from Thirteenth Judicial District, case number D-1329-CV-2020-01391. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Pleadings Served), #2 Exhibit B (Civil Cover Sheet))(Williams, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin et al v. Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Patricia Williams
Represented By: Melanie A. Prince-Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Credit Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Williams
Represented By: Melanie A. Prince-Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Griffin
Represented By: Robert D Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Griffin
Represented By: Robert D Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?