International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492 v. Data Monitor Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492
Defendant: Data Monitor Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01023
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492 (Montalbano, James)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 12/28/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/7/2020. (kc)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Data Monitor Systems, Inc. (Jarrett, Danny)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492 by Data Monitor Systems, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492.(Jarrett, Danny)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492. Data Monitor Systems, Inc. served on 10/20/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Montalbano, James)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce Arbitration Award against DATA MONITOR SYSTEMS, INC. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Montalbano, James)
October 7, 2020 Summons Issued as to Data Monitor Systems, Inc. (arp)
October 7, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7345594 re #1 Complaint, filed by International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492 (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Montalbano, James)
October 7, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492 v. Data Monitor Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Data Monitor Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Danny W. Jarrett
Represented By: Jay Joseph Athey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union 492
Represented By: James A. Montalbano
Represented By: Shane C Youtz
Represented By: Stephen Curtice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?