Dull v. United States of America
Petitioner: Brian Dull
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01032
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson. (meq)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson dismissing #1 Petition for 2241 Relief. (meq)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. Mail sent to Brian Dull. (cmm)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Show Cause Response due by November 30, 2020. (atc)
October 8, 2020 United States Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Brian Dull. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dull v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Dull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?