Kaufman v. Blazin Wings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaufman Justin and Justin Kaufman
Defendant: Raemond Matkin, Adam Morales, Blazin Wings, Inc. and Blazin Wings, Inc. a Minnesota corporation doing business as Buffalo Wild Wings
Case Number: 1:2020cv01051
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 9, 10 and 18. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
December 2, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blazin Wings, Inc. Discovery Responses (Najjar, Jared)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Daniel Albert Najjar on behalf of Raemond Matkin, Adam Morales (Najjar, Jared)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Justin Kaufman re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Kaufman (Cohen, Seth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Kaufman. (Cohen, Seth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Najjar, Jared)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 4) are VACATED. (kc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Justin Kaufman (Cohen, Seth)
November 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Justin Kaufman. (Cohen, Seth)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION by Blazin Wings, Inc. (Najjar, Jared)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Najjar, Jared)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/20/2020. (kc)
October 14, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7356934 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Najjar, Jared)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 13, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 2 (Las Cruces) to 1 (Albuquerque). (arp)
October 13, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blazin Wings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Wild Wings, Corporate Parent IRB Holding Corp., Corporate Parent ARG IH, LLC, Corporate Parent Inspire Brands, Inc., Corporate Parent ARG Investment Corporation for Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Najjar, Jared)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blazin Wings, Inc. from 1st Judicial District, County of Santa fe, case number D-101-CV-2020-01874. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Najjar, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Blazin Wings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raemond Matkin
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Morales
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazin Wings, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blazin Wings, Inc. a Minnesota corporation doing business as Buffalo Wild Wings
Represented By: Jared Daniel Albert Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaufman Justin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Kaufman
Represented By: Seth T. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?