Parrish v. City of Albuquerque et al
Plaintiff: Theresa Parrish
Defendant: Albuquerque International Sunport, City of Albuquerque Aviation Department, City of Albuquerque, Delta Airlines, Inc. and Individual Does
Case Number: 1:2020cv01055
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Theresa Parrish re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Theresa Parrish (Romero, Geoffrey)
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Reply in Support of Motion to Remand) filed by Theresa Parrish. (Romero, Geoffrey)
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 17. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)
November 20, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Laskey, H)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 5) are VACATED. (kc)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Theresa Parrish. (Vargas, Ray)
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by City of Albuquerque of Consent to Removal (Laskey, H)
October 30, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of Albuquerque. (Laskey, H)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Delta Airlines, Inc.. (Laskey, H)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by H Brook Laskey on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Laskey, H)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by H Brook Laskey on behalf of Delta Airlines, Inc. (Laskey, H)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc. by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: William J. Katt Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP 740 N. Plankinton Ave., Suite 600Milwaukee, WI 53203 414-292-3018 william.katt@wilsonelser.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Delta Airlines, Inc. by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: Claire W. Parsons Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP 909 Fannin St., Suite 3300Houston, TX 77010 713-353-2039 claire.parsons@wilsonelser.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 16, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7360697 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
October 16, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7360715 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Delta Airlines, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/23/2020. (kc)
October 14, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7355302 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Banville, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Airlines,Inc (Banville, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Banville on behalf of Delta Airlines,Inc (Banville, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Delta Airlines,Inc from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2020-05054. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Delta Airlines,Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Banville, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. City of Albuquerque et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Parrish
Represented By: Ray M Vargas, II
Represented By: Geoffrey R Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque International Sunport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque Aviation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albuquerque
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Represented By: William Katt
Represented By: Claire W. Parson
Represented By: Kevin J. Banville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Represented By: Kevin J. Banville
Represented By: William Katt
Represented By: Claire W. Parson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Individual Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?