Serrano v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Jose W. Serrano
Defendant: Jane Does, John Does, Anthony Griego, Albuquerque Public Schools and Jason Hollis-Reynolds
Case Number: 1:2020cv01061
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines (Doc. 22) is granted. Plaintiff is to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 1/4/2021. Defendants are to seek leave to amend and join additional parties by 2/4/2021. (kmt)
December 3, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Case Management Deadlines by Jose W. Serrano. (Lopez, Alicia)
November 25, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Hollis-Reynolds Defendant Jason Hollis-Reynolds Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Robles, Luis)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 2/24/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom videoconferencing before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 2/12/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendants by 1/29/2021. Defendants' counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 2/8/2021. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 2/10/2021. (kmt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/13/2020. (kmt)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 12/4/2020. Defendants to seek leave to join and amend by 1/4/2021. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 3/1/2021. Defendants' expert disclosures due by 4/16/2021. Discovery due by 6/30/2021. Discovery motions due by 7/20/2021. Pretrial motions due by 7/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendants by 10/29/2021 and from Defendants to the Court by 11/12/2021. (kmt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 13. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose W. Serrano Amended Certificate of Service Regarding Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Lopez, Alicia)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose W. Serrano Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Lopez, Alicia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Public Schools, Anthony Griego of Initial Disclosures (Muirhead, Megan)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Defendant Jason Hollis-Reynolds's Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Sexual Misconduct, Sexual Assault, and Sexual Harassment by Jason Hollis-Reynolds. (Robles, Luis)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Albuquerque Public Schools, Anthony Griego (Muirhead, Megan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albuquerque Public Schools of First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Jose Serrano (Muirhead, Megan)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Consuelo Lopez on behalf of Jose W. Serrano (Lopez, Alicia)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn M. Nichols on behalf of Jose W. Serrano (Nichols, Carolyn)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 10/23/2020. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 11/4/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 11/13/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/6/2020. (kmt)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number ANMDC-7356267 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Jason Hollis-Reynolds (Robles, Luis)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Albuquerque Public Schools, Anthony Griego. (Muirhead, Megan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthony Griego, Albuquerque Public Schools from Second Judicial, Bernalillo County, case number D-202-CV-2020-05169. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Anthony Griego, Albuquerque Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Muirhead, Megan)
October 14, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Albuquerque Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Griego
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Amanda Krasulick
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albuquerque Public Schools
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Amanda Krasulick
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hollis-Reynolds
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose W. Serrano
Represented By: Margaret Moses Branch
Represented By: Erika E Anderson
Represented By: Carolyn M. Nichols
Represented By: Alicia Consuelo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?