Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Defendant: Phillip Nickse, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington and Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01083
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
2 Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra)
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R Blanton on behalf of All Defendants (Blanton, Jose)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Consolidation by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Consolidating Motions to Remand for decision in the following cases: 20-cv-00958-JCH/CG: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00961-JB-SCY; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00962-SCY-LF; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00963-LF-GJF; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-00964-JAP-SCY; Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-01080-JFR-LF; and Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc., et al., 20-cv-01083-JHR-LF. (baw)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 9. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 (b)(2), the Court finds good cause to delay entering a scheduling order at this time due to the pending motion to remand (Doc. 6). [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cd)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Beerle, Sandra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington. (Beerle, Sandra)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Beerle, Sandra)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court - County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2020-01781. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Coronel, Patrick)
October 19, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7364850 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)
October 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?