Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Defendant: Phillip Nickse, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington and Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01131
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical PI Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Strike #20 Response, to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority re #19 Notice (Other), filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amendment to the Declaration, #2 Exhibit Fourth Advisory Opinion 20-04) (Sedillo, Carlos)
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Waleko, Alexandra)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera Consolidating Motion to Remand #4 with other Motions to Remand in cases, named herein, that all involve common questions of law and fact and the motions to remand all involve the same issue. (baw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Todd Lopez re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Todd Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maglioli Complaint) (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Waleko, Alexandra)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R Blanton on behalf of All Defendants (Blanton, Jose)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 11 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Farmington Operations, LLC, 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Todd Lopez. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Farmington Operations, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Beerle, Sandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Life Care Center of Farmington, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Beerle, Sandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 13 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Phillip Nickse. (Blanton, Jose)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Life Care Centers of America, Inc.. (Blanton, Jose)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Farmington Operations, LLC. (Blanton, Jose)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Todd Lopez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Sedillo, Carlos)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar Finding Good Cause to Delay Scheduling Order. All instructions, deadlines and hearings in the Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 3) are VACATED. (kc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Todd Lopez. (Sedillo, Carlos)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. The parties are to call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/23/2020. (kc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from First Judicial District Court - County of Santa Fe, case number D-101-CV-2020-01939. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Ex C)(Coronel, Patrick)
November 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7387367 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Life Care Center of Farmington, Farmington Operations, LLC, Life Care Centers of America, Inc., Phillip Nickse (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Coronel, Patrick)
November 2, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Life Care Centers of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Nickse
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Operations, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Center of Farmington
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Centers of America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick A. Coronel
Represented By: Denise Michelle Chanez
Represented By: Sandra L Beerle
Represented By: Jose R Blanton
Represented By: Angelica M. Lopez
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Represented By: Alexandra Waleko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Lopez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Henry
Represented By: Joshua K Conaway
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?